skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:10:01 AM

Rachlis, Anita Rochelle

CPSO#: 25835

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H266 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6044
Fax: (416) 480-4268 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Val Rachlis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rachlis ( CPSO# 25834 )
Dr. A. Rachlis ( CPSO# 25835 )

Business Address:
168 Old Forest Hill Road
Toronto ON  M6C 2G8
Phone Number: (416) 783-3416

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANITA ROCHELLE RACHLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACHLIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1973