skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 10:20:03 PM

Seguin, Bernard Albert

CPSO#: 25788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bernard Seguin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BERNARD ALBERT SEGUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGUIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973