skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 10:55:10 PM

Barker, Eric James

CPSO#: 25699

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Barker, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents may obtain their records at: Lead FHO Physician Allied Health Bldg Ste 202 369 Mary St Wiarton ON N0H 2T0
Date Received: 06 Feb 2019


Address: c/o Dr. Eric Barker PO Box 591 Wiarton, ON N0H 2T0
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018