skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 3:12:30 AM

Hanna, Sherif Sami

CPSO#: 25364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Nov 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 Tally Lane
Toronto ON  M2K 1V4
Phone: (416) 272-8430 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sherif Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hanna ( CPSO# 25364 )

Business Address:
14 Tally Lane
Toronto ON  M2K 1V4
Phone Number: (416) 272-8430


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHERIF SAMI HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1972