skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 5:12:41 AM

Persad, Emmanuel

CPSO#: 25198

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Sep 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7011
Fax: (905) 472-7371 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMMANUEL PERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1972