skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/04/2019 2:34:07 PM

Poulakakis, George Matthew

CPSO#: 25143

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jul 2004

Summary

Date of Death: 22-Mar-2010

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2004