skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/07/2019 7:27:38 PM

Sanz, George

CPSO#: 24880

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011