skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:17:03 AM

Dolbear, Betty Edna

CPSO#: 24548

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Betty Dolbear Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2014