skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 1:07:31 AM

Zalev, Arthur Harold

CPSO#: 24495

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Apr 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Radiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5740
Fax: (416) 864-5830 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arthur H. Zalev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Radiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5740

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARTHUR HAROLD ZALEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALEV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1972