skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 12:04:20 PM

Palframan, David Seymour

CPSO#: 24166

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.S. Palframan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 2110 Applewood Crescent Ottawa ON K1H 6B5
Date Received: 24 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2019