skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:53:54 PM

Zerafa, Allan Edgard

CPSO#: 24051

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993