skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:13:15 AM

Pickering, Robert David

CPSO#: 23613

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Mar 2012