skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/04/2019 12:09:03 PM

Henderson, Patricia Maureen

CPSO#: 23360

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: Cotton, Patricia Maureen (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2006