skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 10:00:22 PM

Lenczner, Eric Michael

CPSO#: 22885

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2011