skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:56:55 PM

Barrett, Joyce Louise

CPSO#: 22784

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Nov 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Nov 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 18-Jan-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Nov 1998