skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/09/2019 12:19:06 PM

Nethercott, James Ronson

CPSO#: 22750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 1993