skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 7:10:16 PM

Merker, Donald Stanley

CPSO#: 22722

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Donald Merker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 13 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1 888 563 3732 Fax: 416 398 5932 www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 12 Jan 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2013