skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 12:08:47 PM

Cheng, Pay-Zen

CPSO#: 22483

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Japanese

Education:National Taiwan University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2001