skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 12:32:01 PM

Prior, Donald Frederick

CPSO#: 22073

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 3 Ingleview Drive Inglewood ON L7C 1P3
Date Received: 19 May 2016


Address: Patients may email Dr. Prior at dfprior.md@gmail.com to request copies of medical records.
Date Received: 18 Nov 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016