skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 6:15:03 PM

Macrae, Emerson Earl

CPSO#: 22068

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Macrae directly by telephone at: 519-686-6626.
Date Received: 03 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2016