skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:14:45 AM

Robinson, Geraldine Gail Erlick

CPSO#: 21852

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Apr 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
FG63 - 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5677
Fax: (416) 480-6878 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G.E. Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Robinson ( CPSO# 21852 )

Business Address:
FG63 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GERALDINE GAIL ERLICK ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1969