skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 4:08:41 AM

Halperin, Mitchell Lewis

CPSO#: 21583

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 60 Mosedale Crescent North York ON M2J 3A4
Date Received: 23 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018