skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 5:01:34 AM

Boorany, Suliman Essop

CPSO#: 21484

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995