skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 11:51:36 AM

Allin, Warren Drew

CPSO#: 21468

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 1968
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute
Unit 605
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone: (905) 451-4560 Ext. 229
Fax: (905) 459-5085 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Canada
Phone: (905) 820-3937
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Warren Allin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Allin ( CPSO# 21468 )

Business Address:
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-3937

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute
605 - 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 459-6710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WARREN DREW ALLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1968