skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 4:09:50 PM

Warma, Sushil Kumar

CPSO#: 21276

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 270 Oxford Street Ingersoll, ON N5C 2W1
Date Received: 08 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014