skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 4:47:44 AM

Boag, Lorna Christian

CPSO#: 21136

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992