skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 7:42:41 PM

Glaister, Joseph Tertius Drysdale

CPSO#: 21065

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Oct 2013

Summary

Date of Death: 28-Oct-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Oct 2013