skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/07/2019 8:27:13 PM

Ernest, Maurice

CPSO#: 21053

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 23-Apr-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1998