skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/07/2019 7:53:32 PM

Went, John Harvey

CPSO#: 21004

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2018