skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 6:06:03 AM

Graham, John Donald

CPSO#: 20999

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2007