skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/09/2019 6:33:41 PM

Girvan, David Pugsley

CPSO#: 20940

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Girvan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014