skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 10:19:04 PM

Skory, Gerald Michael

CPSO#: 20854

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: All medical records created prior to December 2009 are with DocuDavit Solutions Storage Facility. All medical records created after January 2010, please contact Dr. Amy Wong at: Unit 18 16945 Leslie Street Newmarket ON L3Y 9A2
Date Received: 02 Oct 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2017