skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 10:35:07 PM

Soboloff, Michael Jay

CPSO#: 20759

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1967

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stn E
P O Box 416
Toronto ON  M6H 4E3
Phone: (416) 537-2527
Fax: (416) 537-1280 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Park Nursing Home
450 Rustic Road
Toronto ON  M6L 1W9
Canada
Phone: (416) 247-0531
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hellenic Care
215 Tyrrel Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 4A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 654-7718
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Gardens
25 Brunswick Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 963-9640
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Maynard Nursing Home
28 Halton Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1R3
Canada
Phone: (416) 533-5198
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Elm Grove Nursing Home
35 Elm Grove Avenue
Toronto ON  M6J 2J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 537-2465
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Downsview Long Term Care
3595 Keels St.
Toronto
Toronto ON  M3J 1M7
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-3431
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Soboloff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Soboloff ( CPSO# 20759 )

Business Address:
PO Box 416
Station E
Toronto ON  M6H 4E3
Phone Number: (416) 537-2527

Business Address:
Downsview Long Term Care
3595 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 1M7
Phone Number: (416) 633-3431

Business Address:
North Park Nursing Home
450 Rustic Road
Toronto ON  M6L 1W9
Phone Number: (416) 247-0531

Business Address:
Hellenic Care
215 Tyrrel Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 4A9
Phone Number: (416) 654-7718

Business Address:
Kensington Gardens
25 Brunswick Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 963-9640

Business Address:
Maynard Nursing Home
28 Halton Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1R3
Phone Number: (416) 533-5198

Business Address:
Elm Grove Nursing Home
35 Elm Grove Avenue
Toronto ON  M6J 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 537-2465

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAY SOBOLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBOLOFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1967