skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 2:21:30 PM

Waldron, John Joseph

CPSO#: 20533

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2000