skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 8:51:23 PM

Drake, Robert Michael

CPSO#: 20507

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 16 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Oct 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Oct-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For copies of medical records please contact Honey Alzner at 519-819-1000.
Date Received: 18 Oct 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 16 Oct 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Michael Drake to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Drake’s recordkeeping in his work as a psychotherapist. Dr. Drake has ceased to practice as a psychotherapist and has limited his practice to coroner work. Dr. Drake will not treat any patients in any capacity or prescribe any medication to any person.