skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:29:33 AM

Mattimoe, Peter Francis

CPSO#: 20501

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Sep 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1906
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1990