skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/04/2019 11:55:10 AM

Williams, Brian Douglas

CPSO#: 20425

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Date of Death: 17-Nov-2005

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003