skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 8:27:45 PM

Smith, Peter Mortley

CPSO#: 19761

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2000