skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 4:16:32 AM

Pitt, Paul Leonard

CPSO#: 19576

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 1965
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 403
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 261-7223
Fax: (416) 261-6374 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul L. Pitt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Pitt ( CPSO# 19576 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 261-7223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL LEONARD PITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1965