skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/07/2019 10:31:40 PM

Tomas, John

CPSO#: 19558

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Slovak

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 2017