skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 4:31:52 AM

Aziz, Youssef

CPSO#: 19550

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994