skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 11:34:50 PM

Manderville, Eugene Alan

CPSO#: 19451

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RR4 3858A Old Highway 2 Belleville ON K8N 4Z4 Tel: 613-962-6451
Date Received: 26 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016