skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 4:02:21 AM

Wainwright, Richard Martin

CPSO#: 19401

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Date of Death: 8-Oct-2009

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008