skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/09/2019 12:19:34 PM

McKnight, Russel Delbert

CPSO#: 19136

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992