skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 4:34:08 PM

Foster, David Dryhurst

CPSO#: 18563

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Date of Death: 3-Jan-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006