skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 12:38:17 AM

Russell, Nicholas Christie

CPSO#: 18494

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Mar 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007