skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 8:27:58 PM

Pinto, Ricardo

CPSO#: 18453

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Date of Death: 19-Feb-2011

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Madrid, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007