skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/04/2019 3:14:09 PM

Afrukhteh, Djamal

CPSO#: 18226

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 May 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Apr-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Farsi, French, German

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 May 2010

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 14, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 14, 2010, Dr. Djamal Afrukhteh has undertaken to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to cease to practice medicine in all jurisdictions.