skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 5:11:53 PM

Rosen, Irving Earl

CPSO#: 18039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. I.E. Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 85 Walmsley Boulevard Toronto ON M4V 1X7
Date Received: 03 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2018