skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 4:29:37 PM

Ogilvie, Richard Ian

CPSO#: 17905

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Western Hospital 399 Bathurst Toronto, ON M5T 258
Date Received: 08 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Nov 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017